NY S04843 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - PRINT NUMBER 4843A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - PRINT NUMBER 4843A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in braille, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter; applies to all elections, including school elections; directs the state board of elections, and the commissioner of education, to promulgate rules for the preparation, distribution, casting, and canvass of braille ballots.
Title
Provides that absentee ballots for all elections shall be made available in braille, upon request of a blind or visually impaired voter; applies to all elections, including school elections; directs the state board of elections, and the commissioner of education, to promulgate rules for the preparation, distribution, casting, and canvass of braille ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | PRINT NUMBER 4843A | |
2010-07-01 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-23 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A3738 (Same As) 2010-05-17 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS