NY S04841 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the execution of orders not to resuscitate and orders pertaining to life sustaining treatments by physician assistants.
Title
Permits the execution of orders not to resuscitate and orders pertaining to life sustaining treatments by physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.708 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a1162a |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.541 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01162 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.708