NY A01162 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.708
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.708
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the execution of orders not to resuscitate and orders pertaining to life sustaining treatments by physician assistants.
Title
Permits the execution of orders not to resuscitate and orders pertaining to life sustaining treatments by physician assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.708 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a1162a |
2019-05-22 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.541 |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s4841 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.235 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | print number 1162a |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04841 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - SIGNED CHAP.708