NY S04772 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.475
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.475
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes motion picture theatres to serve alcoholic beverages.
Title
Authorizes motion picture theatres to serve alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.475 |
2011-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.227 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a7315 |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.860 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-04-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07315 (Same As) 2011-06-15 - substituted by s4772