NY S04766 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sealing and expungement of records in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Title
Relates to the sealing and expungement of records in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.344 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.712 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07552 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES