NY A07552 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sealing and expungement of records in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Title
Relates to the sealing and expungement of records in persons in need of supervision cases in family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.523 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.238 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.238 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04766 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES