NY S04715 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 4715A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - PRINT NUMBER 4715A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Title
Relates to requiring gas corporations to file annual gas safety reports.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4715A |
2018-03-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02320 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - enacting clause stricken
A10004 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - advanced to third reading cal.769
A10004 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - advanced to third reading cal.769