NY S04694 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes paid family leave for bereavement beginning in 2021.
Title
Authorizes paid family leave for bereavement beginning in 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06891 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - enacting clause stricken
A10272 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - referred to labor
A10272 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - referred to labor