NY S04658 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.388
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.388
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all first-term members of boards of education to attend training sessions within one year of taking office to acquaint such member with the powers, functions and duties of boards of education and other administrative authorities affecting public education.
Title
Requires all first-term members of boards of education to attend training sessions within one year of taking office to acquaint such member with the powers, functions and duties of boards of education and other administrative authorities affecting public education.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Foley [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-13 | SIGNED CHAP.388 | |
2010-08-03 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-24 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-24 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-24 | ordered to third reading cal.223 | |
2010-06-24 | substituted for a2693b | |
2010-06-18 | referred to education | |
2010-06-18 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-18 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1023 | |
2010-06-17 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2010-04-19 | PRINT NUMBER 4658B | |
2010-04-19 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2010-01-15 | PRINT NUMBER 4658A | |
2010-01-15 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2009-04-27 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A2693-A (Same As) 2010-06-24 - substituted by s4658b