NY S04631 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4631A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4631A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2021.
Title
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Monica Martinez [D] |
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4631A |
2020-07-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1817 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05895 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments