NY S04563 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4563A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4563A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain school districts and BOCES to establish a retirement contribution reserve fund for the purposes of the NYS teachers' retirement system.
Title
Relates to allowing certain school districts and BOCES to establish a retirement contribution reserve fund for the purposes of the NYS teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4563A |
2018-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.768 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07353 (Same As) 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS