NY A07353 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-17)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-16 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain school districts and BOCES to establish a retirement contribution reserve fund for the purposes of the NYS teachers' retirement system.
Title
Relates to allowing certain school districts and BOCES to establish a retirement contribution reserve fund for the purposes of the NYS teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.871 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | print number 7353b |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.545 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.545 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | print number 7353a |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04563 (Same As) 2018-01-23 - PRINT NUMBER 4563A