NY S04485 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires department of transportation to defer to the town board of the town of Riverhead, requests for speed limit changes on town highways.
Title
Requires department of transportation to defer to the town board of the town of Riverhead, requests for speed limit changes on town highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2015-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.616 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06353 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation