NY S04479 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-03 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to repossession of motor vehicle or motorcycle.
Title
Relates to repossession of motor vehicle or motorcycle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.407 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1616 |
2015-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09785 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - referred to transportation