NY S04426 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state power authority to issue requests for proposals on certain gas turbine generators installed in and around the New York metropolitan area.
Title
Directs the New York state power authority to issue requests for proposals on certain gas turbine generators installed in and around the New York metropolitan area.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-09 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4426A |
2014-03-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.247 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.544 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10047 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions