NY S04342 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to persons who may become a voluntary administrator; includes fiduciaries of a deceased distributee, or a competent adult who is not a distributee upon the filed consent of all competent distributees as persons who can become a voluntary administrator prior to the chief fiscal officer of the county becoming such.
Title
Relates to persons who may become a voluntary administrator; includes fiduciaries of a deceased distributee, or a competent adult who is not a distributee upon the filed consent of all competent distributees as persons who can become a voluntary administrator prior to the chief fiscal officer of the county becoming such.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2024-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.413 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04269 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to judiciary