NY S04337 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cities with a population of one million or more to collect discarded recyclable materials at city parks, playgrounds, historic sites and other recreational facilities; requires the posting of signs on facilities without trash receptacles stating that trash must be retained until you reach a trash can; provides state assistance for such programs.
Title
Requires cities with a population of one million or more to collect discarded recyclable materials at city parks, playgrounds, historic sites and other recreational facilities; requires the posting of signs on facilities without trash receptacles stating that trash must be retained until you reach a trash can; provides state assistance for such programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-03-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.489 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1312 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03395 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation