NY S04286 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 4286A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - PRINT NUMBER 4286A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state school resource officer program; provides for grants for school resource officers (Part A); relates to peace officers who are retired police officers employed by a school district as a school resource officer (Part B); allows retired police officers to be employed by a school district as a school safety officer, school security officer or any other substantially similar position for an annual salary of $50,000 or less to continue to receive their full retirement benefit (Part C).
Title
Establishes the New York state school resource officer program; provides for grants for school resource officers (Part A); relates to peace officers who are retired police officers employed by a school district as a school resource officer (Part B); allows retired police officers to be employed by a school district as a school safety officer, school security officer or any other substantially similar position for an annual salary of $50,000 or less to continue to receive their full retirement benefit (Part C).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4286A |
2022-03-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09432 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - held for consideration in education