NY S04079 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4079A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4079A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state thruway authority to establish an electronic toll collection device for motor vehicles used by farms which grants a discount for use of the thruway.
Title
Directs the New York state thruway authority to establish an electronic toll collection device for motor vehicles used by farms which grants a discount for use of the thruway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4079A |
2022-04-19 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08804 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - referred to transportation