LA SB301 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for transactions involving firearms and ammunition retailers. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides for transactions involving firearms and ammunition retailers. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 301 FINAL PASSAGE (#315) (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |