LA HB789 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to court reporter fees in the Fourteenth Judicial District (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to court reporter fees in the Fourteenth Judicial District (EG INCREASE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |