GA SB344 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 610
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 610
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use taxes, so as to exempt sales of firearms, ammunition, gun safes, and related accessories during an 11 day period each year; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and Use Taxes; firearms, ammunition, gun safes, and related accessories during an 11 day period each year; exempt
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #830 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #770 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #471 (Y: 30 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 189, Sb 344: Senate Vote #467 (Y: 30 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #770 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #471 (Y: 30 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 189, Sb 344: Senate Vote #467 (Y: 30 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Act 610 | |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-21 | House | House Postponed |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |