NY S02960 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for adjustment of the maximum income threshold for eligibility for the senior citizen rent increase exemption (SCRIE), disability rent increase exemption (DRIE), senior citizen homeowners' exemption (SCHE), and disabled homeowners' exemption (DHE) by any increase in the consumer price index (CPI).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for adjustment of the maximum income threshold for eligibility for the senior citizen rent increase exemption (SCRIE), disability rent increase exemption (DRIE), senior citizen homeowners' exemption (SCHE), and disabled homeowners' exemption (DHE) by any increase in the consumer price index (CPI).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-23SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 2960A
2024-05-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1105
2024-03-12SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2023-01-26SenateREFERRED TO AGING

Same As/Similar To

A05741 (Same As) 2024-05-28 - print number 5741a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback