NY S04058 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5616B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5616B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York state first home savings program to authorize first time home buyers to establish savings accounts to buy their first home.
Title
Establishes the New York state first home savings program to authorize first time home buyers to establish savings accounts to buy their first home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5616B |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1950 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4058B |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4058A |
2017-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05616 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - approval memo.43