NY A05616 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 75-4)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the New York state first home savings program to authorize first time home buyers to establish savings accounts to buy their first home.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the New York state first home savings program to authorize first time home buyers to establish savings accounts to buy their first home.

Sponsors

Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. James Skoufis [D]Asm. Robin Schimminger [D]Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Earlene Hooper [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Frank Skartados [D]
Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]Asm. Luis Sepulveda [D]Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]
Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Francisco Moya [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Pamela Harris [D]
Asm. Michael Kearns [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Mark Gjonaj [D]Asm. Joseph Morelle [D]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Mark Johns [R]
Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Shelley Mayer [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Asm. Addie Jenne [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. William Magee [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Matthew Titone [D]

Roll Calls

2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06Assemblydelivered to governor
2017-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1950
2017-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4058B
2017-06-19SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-19Senatereturned to senate
2017-06-19Assemblyrepassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading 5616b
2017-06-07Assemblyamended on third reading 5616a
2017-06-07Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2017-06-07AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-07Senaterecalled from senate
2017-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.525
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-02-10Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S04058 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5616B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05616&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05616&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05616
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05616&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05616A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05616&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05616B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05616&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05616&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A5616#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback