NY S04054 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-03 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that batteries in battery operated single station smoke detecting alarm devices shall be non-replaceable, non-removable and capable of powering the devices for a minimum of ten years.
Title
Provides that batteries in battery operated single station smoke detecting alarm devices shall be non-replaceable, non-removable and capable of powering the devices for a minimum of ten years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2014-03-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.244 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4054A |
2014-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.446 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05200 (Same As) 2014-06-09 - reported referred to rules