NY S04035 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4035A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4035A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.
Title
Requires optometrists to meet certain standards, including the completion of a course, to prescribe oral medications.
Sponsors
Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Susan Serino [R] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4035A |
2020-07-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.827 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A01193 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES