NY S03939 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Doctors Across New York program to include dentists.
Title
Expands the Doctors Across New York program to include dentists.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Assembly | referred to health |
2018-02-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | AMENDED 3939A |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.197 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.719 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05279 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - print number 5279a