NY S03804 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of the New York farm to school and school garden fund; allows individuals to make a gift on their personal tax form for such fund; such fund will be used to establish school gardens and purchase equipment and educational materials to promote students' consumption of local products conducted in cooperation with the department of agriculture and markets.
Title
Relates to the creation of the New York farm to school and school garden fund; allows individuals to make a gift on their personal tax form for such fund; such fund will be used to establish school gardens and purchase equipment and educational materials to promote students' consumption of local products conducted in cooperation with the department of agriculture and markets.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Assembly | referred to education |
2020-03-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.248 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1006 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3804A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01209 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education