NY S03755 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the reform of charitable organizations in the state of New York.
Title
Relates to the reform of charitable organizations in the state of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2013-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 3755A |
2013-03-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-03-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.223 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05422 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - enacting clause stricken
A07772 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - enacting clause stricken
A07772 (Same As) 2014-03-11 - enacting clause stricken