WI AB1035 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 119.04 (1); and to create 118.143 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring the community approach to four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Title
Requiring the community approach to four-year-old kindergarten. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-02-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-05 | House | Representative Hong withdrawn as a coauthor |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2024-02-01 | House | Introduced |