TN SB1416 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 30 to 60 days, after the order of a court to release money held in trust to the custodian of a minor who was a victim of a crime, the period by which the custodian must provide an accounting to the court as to how the money was spent. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 29 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 29 and Title 40, relative to victim compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/9/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1021 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-24 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.