AK HB145 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to loans in an amount of $25,000 or less; relating to the Nationwide Multistate Licensing System and Registry; relating to deferred deposit advances; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Loans Under $25,000; Payday Loans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Finance CS (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2024-05-09SenateFIN
2024-05-09SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2024-05-08HouseVERSION: CSHB 145(FIN)
2024-05-08HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2024-05-08HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2024-05-08HousePASSED Y37 N2 A1
2024-05-08HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2024-05-08HouseFIN CS ADOPTED Y38 N1 A1
2024-05-08HouseRESCIND ACTION (ADOPTING) L&C CS PASSED Y38 N1 A1
2024-05-08HouseRETURN TO SECOND TO RESCIND CS L&C PASSED Y37 N2 A1
2024-05-08HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 145(L&C)
2024-05-08HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2024
2024-05-01HouseRETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE
2024-05-01HouseFN2: (CED)
2024-05-01HouseFOSTER
2024-05-01HouseDP: STAPP, GALVIN, JOSEPHSON, ORTIZ, CRONK, COULOMBE, TOMASZEWSKI, D.JOHNSON,
2024-05-01HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP
2023-05-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRAY, GALVIN, STORY, JOSEPHSON, FIELDS
2023-05-13HouseRETURNED TO FIN COMMITTEE
2023-05-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CALENDAR
2023-05-13HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N29
2023-05-13HouseL&C CS ADOPTED UC
2023-05-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-05-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2023
2023-05-12HouseFIN REFERRAL REMOVED
2023-05-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MCCORMICK, MEARS
2023-05-10HouseFN1: (CED)
2023-05-10HouseNR: RUFFRIDGE
2023-05-10HouseDNP: PRAX, SUMNER
2023-05-10HouseDP: SADDLER, WRIGHT, CARRICK
2023-05-10HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 3DP 2DNP 1NR
2023-04-28HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HIMSCHOOT, ARMSTRONG
2023-04-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TOMASZEWSKI
2023-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MINA
2023-04-14HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
2023-04-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GROH
2023-03-29HouseL&C
2023-03-29HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback