NY S03751 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to improving evaluations of the potential impact of rules on jobs and employment opportunities.
Title
Relates to improving evaluations of the potential impact of rules on jobs and employment opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3751A |
2018-01-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.100 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.811 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |