NY S03737 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of information technology services to undertake a detailed study of the comparative qualities of cloud computing services and state data center operations.
Title
Requires the director of information technology services to undertake a detailed study of the comparative qualities of cloud computing services and state data center operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Internet and Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1003 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3737A |
2022-04-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2021-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A03908 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - print number 3908a