NY A03908 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - print number 3908a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - print number 3908a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the director of information technology services to undertake a detailed study of the comparative qualities of cloud computing services and state data center operations.
Title
Requires the director of information technology services to undertake a detailed study of the comparative qualities of cloud computing services and state data center operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Assembly | print number 3908a |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03737 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - referred to governmental operations