NY S03597 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that students may be employed for up to five hours on any day preceding a school day as a qualified lifeguard or aquatic supervisory staff, provided that the employer receives and maintains both the written consent of the minor's parent or guardian and a certificate which shall be provided to the employer at the end of each marking period by the minor's school which shall assert that such minor is in satisfactory academic standing.
Title
Provides that students may be employed for up to five hours on any day preceding a school day as a qualified lifeguard or aquatic supervisory staff, provided that the employer receives and maintains both the written consent of the minor's parent or guardian and a certificate which shall be provided to the employer at the end of each marking period by the minor's school which shall assert that such minor is in satisfactory academic standing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.219 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2013-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05224 (Same As) 2014-01-27 - REFERRED TO LABOR