NY S03475 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates that no employee or officer of the university shall determine the specific details of a student's immigration status except when required by federal law, pursuant to a court order or as required in connection with tuition or financial aid eligibility.
Title
Mandates that no employee or officer of the university shall determine the specific details of a student's immigration status except when required by federal law, pursuant to a court order or as required in connection with tuition or financial aid eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.679 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06220 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to higher education