NY S03466 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Deerfield in Oneida county to transfer jurisdiction of a road to the state.
Title
Authorizes the town of Deerfield in Oneida county to transfer jurisdiction of a road to the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2020-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.753 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1296 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04806 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
A10736 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - referred to transportation
A10736 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - referred to transportation