NY S03217 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-11 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires banks to disclose any negative consequences of establishing an alternative payment schedule on a loan.
Title
Requires banks to disclose any negative consequences of establishing an alternative payment schedule on a loan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2018-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3217A |
2018-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.649 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.532 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07228 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to banks