NY S03143 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to exempting the Rochester-Genesee Regional Transportation Authority from bond issuance charges.
Title
Relates to exempting the Rochester-Genesee Regional Transportation Authority from bond issuance charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1365 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2017-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.618 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |