NY S03138 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates state route 23 as a state arterial highway in the city of Norwich, county of Chenango.
Title
Designates state route 23 as a state arterial highway in the city of Norwich, county of Chenango.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2012-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.955 |
2011-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03632 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to transportation