NY S03126 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-24 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a service learning program for students serving as active volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers, and mandates certain features of such program.
Title
Creates a service learning program for students serving as active volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers, and mandates certain features of such program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | referred to education |
2016-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.923 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1158 |
2015-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02896 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to education