NY S03124 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 90 day application period for the issuance of temporary authority or emergency temporary authority that relates to a specific event in the state, except when event will be held in less than 90 days; specifies what must be included in an application and the commissioner's responsibilities with respect to such application.
Title
Establishes a 90 day application period for the issuance of temporary authority or emergency temporary authority that relates to a specific event in the state, except when event will be held in less than 90 days; specifies what must be included in an application and the commissioner's responsibilities with respect to such application.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3124A |
2015-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.385 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |