NY S03082 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in private passenger cars, vans and trucks where a minor less than 14 years of age is a passenger in such vehicles; provides for rebuttable presumption; provides that violations of such provisions shall be subject to a fine of not more than $100.
Title
Prohibits smoking in private passenger cars, vans and trucks where a minor less than 14 years of age is a passenger in such vehicles; provides for rebuttable presumption; provides that violations of such provisions shall be subject to a fine of not more than $100.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2011-06-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3082B |
2011-06-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2011-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 3082A |
2011-06-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2011-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07285 (Same As) 2012-02-14 - reported referred to codes