NY A07285 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-5)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking in private passenger cars, vans and trucks where a minor less than 14 years of age is a passenger in such vehicles; provides for rebuttable presumption; provides that violations of such provisions shall be subject to a fine of not more than $100.
Title
Prohibits smoking in private passenger cars, vans and trucks where a minor less than 14 years of age is a passenger in such vehicles; provides for rebuttable presumption; provides that violations of such provisions shall be subject to a fine of not more than $100.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7285b |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 7285a |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.337 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.337 |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-04-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03082 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH