NY S02978 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prescription prices and pharmacies for injured employees.
Title
Relates to prescription prices and pharmacies for injured employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Martin Dilan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. Antoine Thompson [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | referred to labor | |
2010-07-01 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-07-01 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-28 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2978B | |
2010-06-23 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2978A | |
2010-05-24 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-05-18 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-05-17 | 1ST REPORT CAL.547 | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LABOR | |
2009-03-09 | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A6992 (Same As) 2010-07-06 - print number 6992b