NY S02966 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 2966A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 2966A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain watercraft, aircrafts, and trains to use clean energy, including ensuring such vehicles are zero-emissions; requires NYSERDA to study zero-emission commercial vehicles, the use of renewable energy in publicly funded airports, and the use of sustainable aviation fuel; requires NYSERDA to administer a grant program to flying schools and clubs that install charging infrastructure.
Title
Requires certain watercraft, aircrafts, and trains to use clean energy, including ensuring such vehicles are zero-emissions; requires NYSERDA to study zero-emission commercial vehicles, the use of renewable energy in publicly funded airports, and the use of sustainable aviation fuel; requires NYSERDA to administer a grant program to flying schools and clubs that install charging infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2966A |
2024-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2023-02-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02246 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - print number 2246b