NY S02927 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.327
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a person to hold the office of receiver of taxes in the town of North Castle while living outside of such municipality.
Title
Authorizes a person to hold the office of receiver of taxes in the town of North Castle while living outside of such municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.327 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.507 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a4767 |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.173 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04767 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.327