NY S02927 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts school districts from the requirements of smart growth.
Title
Exempts school districts from the requirements of smart growth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.306 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2017-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05469 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to environmental conservation